Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasile Cristea, A.A. †

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Lebedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1906BornSomostelnic Tarnava Mica
27 Mar 193226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
2 Jul 196054.4AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
2 Jul 196054.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebedus
8 Sep 196054.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebedus
10 Oct 198781.6RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
17 Jan 200093.9DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Vasile Cristea:
Bishop Vasile Cristea A.A. (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 90
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013