Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Oliver Van de Velde, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1795Born
25 Sep 182732.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Oct 184853.5AppointedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Feb 184953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
29 Jul 185358.3AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
13 Nov 185560.6DiedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for James Oliver Van de Velde
Bishop James Oliver Van de Velde S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Natchez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLebbeke, Belgium
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200, and Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast