Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Michael Vincent Ryan, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1826Born
6 May 184620.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
24 Jun 184923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
3 Mar 186842.1AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
8 Nov 186842.8Ordained BishopBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
10 Apr 189670.2DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Michael Vincent Ryan (VIAF: 53740124)
Bishop Stephen Michael Vincent Ryan C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmonte, Canada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buffalo, Diocese of Buffalo, New York

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017