Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Murray

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1768Born
1790²21.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 180941.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland
30 Jun 180941.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
30 Nov 180941.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
11 May 182355.0SucceededArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
26 Feb 185283.8DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Murray (VIAF: 89300186)
Archbishop Daniel Murray (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSheepwalk, near Arklow, Co. Wicklow
Ordained BishopLiffeystreet, Chapel, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Pro-Cathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180, and Page 213
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 257, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 45, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 520, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 759, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,279
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 2 Dec 2020

Quantcast