Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Clement Smyth, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1810Born
1 Nov 183929.7ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
29 May 184131.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
9 Jan 185746.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
9 Jan 185746.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
3 May 185747.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
19 Feb 185848.0SucceededBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
23 Sep 186555.6DiedBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Clement Smyth
Bishop Timothy Clement Smyth O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFinlea, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 252, and Page 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017