Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aloysius Joseph Meyer, C.M. †

Deceased

Priest of Congregation of the Mission

Titular See: (declined)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1839Born
1860²20.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
1863²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jul 188141.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Galveston, Texas, USA
5 Jul 188141.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
12 Feb 189858.1DiedPriest of Congregation of the Mission

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Joseph Meyer
Father Aloysius Joseph Meyer C.M. (born , died ) Priest of Congregation of the Mission

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaden, Germany
Ordained PriestSt. Vincent's, Church, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

  • a priest for 35.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017