Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Brendan McCormack

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1935Born
2 Feb 196024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 199560.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 199560.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
27 Dec 199560.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali
21 Jul 199862.9AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
22 Sep 199863.1InstalledBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
19 Sep 201176.1RetiredBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
21 Sep 202186.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for John Brendan McCormack
Bishop John Brendan McCormack (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinthrop, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained PriestBoston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceMount Carmel Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,637
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast