Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Murphy

Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1940 BornBoston
16 Dec 196424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 199555.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 199555.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
27 Dec 199555.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
26 Jun 200161.1AppointedBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
5 Sep 200161.3InstalledBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for William Francis Murphy:
Bishop William Francis Murphy (born ) Bishop of Rockville Centre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,638

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 16 Dec 2014