Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Louis Connolly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fall River, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1894BornFall River
21 Dec 192329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
192429.1IncardinatedPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
7 Apr 194550.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
7 Apr 194550.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
24 May 194550.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
17 May 195156.5SucceededBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
30 Oct 197076.0RetiredBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
30 Oct 197076.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
31 Dec 197076.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
12 Sep 198691.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for James Louis Connolly:
Bishop James Louis Connolly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fall River

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1945, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013