Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael D’Arcy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1932Born
2 Feb 195724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197442.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Dec 197442.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mediana
11 Feb 197542.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mediana
18 Feb 198552.5AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
1 May 198552.7InstalledBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
14 Nov 200977.2RetiredBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
3 Feb 201380.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael D’Arcy
Bishop John Michael D’Arcy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrighton

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jul 2018

Quantcast