Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Vose Daily

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1927Born
10 Jan 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
31 Dec 197447.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
31 Dec 197447.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
11 Feb 197547.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
17 Jul 198456.8AppointedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
20 Feb 199062.4AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
18 Apr 199062.5InstalledBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
1 Aug 200375.8RetiredBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 May 201789.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Vose Daily
Bishop Thomas Vose Daily (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelmont
Ordained PriestHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceImmaculate Conception Center’s Bishop Mugavero Residence, Douglaston, Queens, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017