Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Humberto Sousa Cardinal Medeiros

Deceased

Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1915Born
15 Jun 194630.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
14 Apr 196650.5AppointedBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
9 Jun 196650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
29 Jun 196650.7InstalledBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
8 Sep 197054.9AppointedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Oct 197055.0InstalledArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
5 Mar 197357.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197357.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
17 Sep 198367.9DiedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Humberto Sousa Medeiros (VIAF: 8712307)
Humberto Sousa Cardinal Medeiros (born , died ) Archbishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArrifes, island of São Miguel, Diocese of Angra, Portugal
Ordained PriestFall River, Diocese of Fall River, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Fall River, Diocese of Fall River, Massachusetts
Death PlaceSt. Elizabeth's, Hospital, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Buried Place (Original)Parents' Plot, Saint Patricks, Cemetery, Fall River, Diocese of Fall River, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: CB, 28 Oct 2011
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1973

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast