Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Anton Häring, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1894BornFrittlingen, Germany
191318.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Sep 192026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 192733.1AppointedPrefect of Shohchow, China
25 Apr 193338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
25 Apr 193338.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shohchow [Shuoxian], China
27 Aug 193339.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
11 Apr 194651.9AppointedBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China
25 Jul 197177.2DiedBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China

MicroData Summary for Edgar Anton Häring:
Bishop Edgar Anton Häring O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015