Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Tsung Huai-mo (Zhong Huai-mo), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yantai [Yentai]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1904BornKuotsun
19 Apr 193127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jun 195147.2AppointedBishop of Yantai [Yentai], China
29 Jul 195147.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yantai [Yentai], China
1975²70.7DiedBishop of Yantai [Yentai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Tsung Huai-mo (Zhong Huai-mo):
Bishop Alphonse Tsung Huai-mo (Zhong Huai-mo) O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Yantai [Yentai]

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013