Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

Dioecesis Scioceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 25,000 (9,656 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Shuoxian, Shanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Shohchow
12 July 1926ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Shohchow (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Shohchow [Shuoxian]
17 June 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Shohchow Vicariate Apostolic of Shohchow [Shuoxian]
Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Shohchow [Shuoxian] Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]
195011,0001,300,000.8%325283921020ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 18 Aug 2012