Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Maria (dei Conti) Besi

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China

Titular Bishop of Canopus

Apostolic Delegate to Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1805Born
4 Apr 182923.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 184034.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
10 Jan 184034.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
14 Mar 184135.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
3 Jun 184842.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
9 Jul 185044.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
8 Sep 187165.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Maria (dei Conti) Besi
Bishop Lodovico Maria (dei Conti) Besi (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopTaiyamfou
Death PlaceDesenzano del Garda

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1869
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 7
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 918
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast