Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

Archidioecesis Hancheuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,120 (4,681 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, 16 Shangai Road, Hankou, Hubei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}
2 September 1870SplitVicariate Apostolic of Hupeh {Hu-Pè} Vicariate Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Hankow [Hankou]
12 December 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Hankow [Hankou]
Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hankow [Hankou] Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
195035,2392,200,0001.6%1149605872812825ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013