Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Mazzella, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Rites

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1833BornVitulano
8 Sep 185522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
5 Sep 185926.6ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Jun 188653.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 188653.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
20 Feb 188956.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
22 Jun 189360.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
22 Jun 189663.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
19 Apr 189764.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
19 Apr 189764.2AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
8 May 189764.2Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina, Italy
15 Jun 189764.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
26 Mar 190067.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites

MicroData Summary for Camillo Mazzella:
Cardinal Camillo Mazzella S.J. (born , died ) Prefect of Rites

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013