Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Cardella, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1845Born
19 Sep 186822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
30 Nov 189651.0AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
8 Dec 189651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
6 Feb 191670.2DiedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Cardella
Bishop Michele Cardella C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarlia, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSts. John and Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMarlia, Archdiocese of Lucca

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017