Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Merra

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1838Born
20 Dec 186224.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189961.0AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
21 Dec 189961.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
27 Mar 190566.3AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
21 Jul 191172.6DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Merra (VIAF: 89193246)
Bishop Emanuele Merra (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria, Diocese of Adria
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast