Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Staiti di Brancaleone

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1840Born
19 Sep 186323.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 189959.4AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
25 Jun 189959.4Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
14 Dec 191676.9DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Staiti di Brancaleone
Bishop Giuseppe Staiti di Brancaleone (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopFranciscaines, via Giusti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 33
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,822
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast