Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Benito Galeone

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1935 Born
18 Dec 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
26 Jun 200165.7AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
21 Aug 200165.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
27 Apr 201175.6RetiredBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Victor Benito Galeone
Bishop Victor Benito Galeone (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Augustine.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,027

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast