Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Isern

Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1958 Born
16 Apr 199334.5Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
15 Oct 200951.0AppointedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
10 Dec 200951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
13 Jun 201354.7ResignedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Fernando Isern
Bishop Fernando Isern (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHavana, Cuba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pueblo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,324
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018