Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Nugent Lynch

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1941 Born
13 May 197836.9Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
5 Dec 199554.5AppointedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
26 Jan 199654.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
2 Jun 199857.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
14 Jan 199957.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
28 Nov 201675.5RetiredBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Nugent Lynch
Bishop Robert Nugent Lynch (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Petersburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleston
Ordained BishopSaint Jude the Apostle, Cathedral, Saint Petersburg, Diocese of Saint Petersburg, Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Petersburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,660
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2016
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 May 2018

Quantcast