Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe de Jesús Estévez

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1946 Born
30 May 197024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Matanzas, Cuba
Feb 197932.9IncardinatedPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
21 Nov 200357.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
21 Nov 200357.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Kearney
7 Jan 200457.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Kearney
27 Apr 201165.2AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
2 Jun 201165.3InstalledBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Felipe de Jesús Estévez (VIAF: 23694291)
Bishop Felipe de Jesús Estévez (born ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedro Betancourt, Cuba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Augustine.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Dec 2017