Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Joseph Dewane

Bishop of Venice, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1950 Born
16 Jul 198838.3Ordained PriestPriest of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
25 Apr 200656.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Venice, Florida, USA
25 Jul 200656.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Venice, Florida, USA
19 Jan 200756.8SucceededBishop of Venice, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Frank Joseph Dewane
Bishop Frank Joseph Dewane (born ) Bishop of Venice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreen Bay, WI, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Ordained BishopEpiphany, Cathedral, Venice, Diocese of Venice, Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Venice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,212
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast