Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Eugeniusz Samsel

Deceased

Bishop of Ełk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1940BornMyszyniec
23 May 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
17 May 198242.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
17 May 198242.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Montecorvino
30 May 198242.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Montecorvino
25 Mar 199252.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ełk, Poland
16 Nov 200060.8AppointedBishop of Ełk, Poland
17 Jan 200363.0DiedBishop of Ełk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Eugeniusz Samsel:
Bishop Edward Eugeniusz Samsel (born , died ) Bishop of Ełk

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015