Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugene Louis D’Souza, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bhopal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1917BornNagpur
29 Sep 194426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
12 Jul 195133.6AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
3 Oct 195133.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
19 Sep 195335.8AppointedArchbishop of Nagpur, India
13 Sep 196345.8AppointedArchbishop of Bhopal, India
20 May 199476.5RetiredArchbishop of Bhopal, India
18 Mar 200385.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bhopal, India

MicroData Summary for Eugene Louis D’Souza:
Archbishop Eugene Louis D’Souza M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bhopal

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015