Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaus Tigga

Deceased

Bishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1898Born
19 Nov 192426.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 195557.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India
7 Nov 195557.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Achelous
11 Mar 195658.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achelous
24 Dec 195759.9AppointedBishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India
9 Jul 197072.4DiedBishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Tigga
Bishop Stanislaus Tigga (born , died ) Bishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatkahi

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,956, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast