Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Januarius Paul Palathuruthy, C.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1913BornKonthuruthy
7 Mar 194228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
196248.7AppointedOrdinary of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
29 Jul 196855.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
26 Feb 197763.9AppointedBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
3 May 197764.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
20 Apr 199077.0RetiredBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
28 Mar 199582.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Januarius Paul Palathuruthy:
Bishop Januarius Paul Palathuruthy C.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chanda

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015