Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Gomes, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1910BornKarachi
21 Nov 193626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Jul 197463.8AppointedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
6 Oct 197464.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ahmedabad, India
21 May 199079.7RetiredBishop of Ahmedabad, India
15 Sep 200292.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad, India

MicroData Summary for Charles Gomes:
Bishop Charles Gomes S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013