Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham D. Mattam, C.V. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1922Born
15 Mar 195027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Vincentian Congregation (Syro-Malabar)
29 Jul 196845.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
9 Jan 196946.1InstalledApostolic Exarch of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Feb 197754.2AppointedBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
30 Apr 197754.4Ordained BishopBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Dec 199977.0RetiredBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
16 Apr 201996.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Abraham D. Mattam
Bishop Abraham D. Mattam C.V. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Satna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarianganam
Death PlaceKochi

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • abt: CB, 11 Sep 2015
  • d: CB, 16 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Apr 2019

Quantcast