Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abraham Viruthakulangara

Deceased

Archbishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1943Born
28 Oct 196926.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 197733.7AppointedBishop of Khandwa, India
13 Jul 197734.1Ordained BishopBishop of Khandwa, India
17 Jan 199854.6AppointedArchbishop of Nagpur, India
19 Apr 201874.8DiedArchbishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for Abraham Viruthakulangara
Archbishop Abraham Viruthakulangara (born , died ) Archbishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKallara
Death PlaceCBCI Centre, New Delhi

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast