Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Augustine Charanakunnel

Archbishop Emeritus of Raipur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1938 BornEdamattam
15 May 197536.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 199254.5AppointedBishop of Raipur, India
7 Feb 199354.7Ordained BishopBishop of Raipur, India
27 Feb 200465.7AppointedArchbishop of Raipur, India
3 Jul 201375.1RetiredArchbishop of Raipur, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Augustine Charanakunnel:
Archbishop Joseph Augustine Charanakunnel (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Raipur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Raipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,055
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013