Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Kindo

Deceased

Bishop of Jashpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1947Born
14 Dec 197427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Raigarh, India
25 Nov 198538.5AppointedBishop of Raigarh, India
20 Jan 198638.6Ordained BishopBishop of Raigarh, India
23 Mar 200658.8AppointedBishop of Jashpur, India
25 May 200659.0InstalledBishop of Jashpur, India
12 Jun 200861.0DiedBishop of Jashpur, India

MicroData Summary for Victor Kindo
Bishop Victor Kindo (born , died ) Bishop of Jashpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaraitoli

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2006
  • d: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast