Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clement Thottungal, C.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sagar (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1909BornKandassankadavu
24 Nov 193829.6Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
29 Jul 196859.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Feb 197767.8AppointedBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
25 Apr 197768.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
20 Dec 198677.6RetiredBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Sep 199182.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Clement Thottungal:
Bishop Clement Thottungal C.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sagar

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • abt: CB, 11 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015