Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Perumattam, M.S.T.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Soc. Miss. di S. Tommaso Apotolo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1921BornKakkoor
11 Mar 195129.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 196846.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India
26 Feb 197755.3AppointedBishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 May 197755.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India
4 Apr 199876.4RetiredBishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Jun 201189.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for John Perumattam:
Bishop John Perumattam M.S.T.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ujjain

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Jun 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013