Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Conrad Dubbelman, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jabalpur

Titular Bishop of Adada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1894BornRotterdam, Netherlands
15 Aug 192025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
29 May 193338.6AppointedPrefect of Jubbulpore, India
18 Jul 195459.8AppointedBishop of Jabalpur, India
19 Oct 195460.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jabalpur, India
17 Dec 196571.2ResignedBishop of Jabalpur, India
17 Dec 196571.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Adada
20 Dec 197783.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jabalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Conrad Dubbelman:
Bishop Conrad Dubbelman O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jabalpur

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013