Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paschal Topno, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Bhopal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1932 BornTorpa
31 Jul 196533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Oct 198553.4AppointedBishop of Ambikapur, India
18 Jan 198653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ambikapur, India
20 May 199461.9AppointedArchbishop of Bhopal, India
15 Jun 200775.0RetiredArchbishop of Bhopal, India

MicroData Summary for Paschal Topno:
Archbishop Paschal Topno S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bhopal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bhopal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013