Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Stock Palathara, C.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1935 Born
1 Dec 196429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
16 Dec 199257.1AppointedBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India
19 Mar 199357.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India
16 Jul 201377.7RetiredBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Simon Stock Palathara
Bishop Simon Stock Palathara C.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jagdalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChethipuzha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,061
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast