Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop David Thomas Daniel Macaire, O.P.

Archbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1969 BornNanterre, France
17 Sep 199525.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1998²28.1Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Jun 200131.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Mar 201545.3AppointedArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
12 Apr 201545.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Thomas Daniel Macaire:
Archbishop David Thomas Daniel Macaire O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2015
  • bp/ob: CB, 7 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 9 Mar 2015
  • c2: CB, 11 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 5 Apr 2015
  • mn: CB, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015