Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Assis

Dioecesis Assisensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Benedito Simão, Bishop
  • Antônio de Souza, C.S.S., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 30 November 1928
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Botucatu
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 9,077 (3,505 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul I
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Dom Jose Lazaro Nevez 414, 19814-391 Assis, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (018) 3322-2279
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
30 November 1928ErectedDiocese of Botucatu Diocese of Assis (erected)
16 January 1960Territory LostDiocese of Assis Diocese of Presidente Prudente (erected)
30 December 1998Territory LostDiocese of Assis
Archdiocese of Botucatu
Diocese of Itapeva
Diocese of Ourinhos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950600,000630,00095.2%15243915,384105233ap1951
1959600,000630,00095.2%1645619,836458838ap1960
1966320,000350,00091.4%1033437,441217423ap1967
1970270,000300,00090.0%1033436,279379727ap1971
1976270,000320,00084.4%1324377,297307533ap1977
1977250,000349,00071.6%1325386,578287231ap1981
1990395,000440,00089.8%18163411,617167632ap1991
1999230,000300,00076.7%3122534,339449831ap2000
2000230,071279,69982.3%2613395,899135425ap2001
2001215,000279,69976.9%3813514,215245125ap2002
2002223,000289,19477.1%2413376,027245125ap2003
2003223,000262,51384.9%2815435,186263125ap2004
2004245,000289,19484.7%2416406,125273925ap2005
2006252,000296,00085.1%1914337,636273625ap2007
2012267,000314,00085.0%3510455,933212325ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013