Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Lima

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1924BornTiros
8 Dec 194824.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 197349.1AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
15 Jul 197349.4Ordained BishopBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
7 Jun 198157.3AppointedBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Oct 199975.7RetiredBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Jun 201389.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Lima:
Bishop José de Lima (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sete Lagoas

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 1 Dec 2013