Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waldemar Chaves de Araújo

Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1934 Born
22 Sep 196228.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 198955.3AppointedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Feb 199055.5Ordained BishopBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Jun 199661.9AppointedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 May 201075.8RetiredBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Waldemar Chaves de Araújo
Bishop Waldemar Chaves de Araújo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Despacho

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São João del Rei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,424
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast