Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Martins da Silva, S.D.N. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1936Born
29 Jun 196327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Other
3 Jan 197841.5AppointedPrelate of Vila Rondônia, Rondonia, Brazil
2 Apr 197841.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Vila Rondônia, Rondonia, Brazil
4 Oct 198246.3AppointedArchbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
3 Sep 199761.2ResignedArchbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
29 Jan 201578.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Martins da Silva
Archbishop José Martins da Silva S.D.N. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Porto Velho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiros

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Jan 2015
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 4,300
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast