Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Charpenet, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yagoua, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1927Born
29 Sep 195124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Mar 196840.8AppointedPrefect of Yagoua, Cameroon
29 Jan 197345.7AppointedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
1 Jul 197346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
5 Dec 197750.6DiedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Louis Charpenet
Bishop Louis Charpenet O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Yagoua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaretz, France
Ordained BishopIn front of, Cathedral, Garoua, Diocese of Garoua

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast