Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Alí Cardinal Lebrún Moratinos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1919BornPuerto Cabello
19 Dec 194324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
2 Aug 195637.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
2 Aug 195637.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
2 Sep 195637.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
21 Jun 195839.2AppointedBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
19 Mar 196243.0AppointedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
21 Sep 197253.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
21 Sep 197253.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Voncaria
24 May 198061.1SucceededArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Feb 198363.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198363.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
27 May 199576.1RetiredArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
21 Feb 200181.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Alí Lebrún Moratinos:
José Alí Cardinal Lebrún Moratinos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
  • a cardinal for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 76
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015