Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mojoli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1905Born
18 Mar 192822.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 196055.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
27 Sep 196055.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Ethiopia
28 Oct 196055.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
14 Nov 196964.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
Dec 1971³66.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
9 Mar 198074.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mojoli
Archbishop Giuseppe Mojoli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCovo

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast