Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bertoglio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1900BornMagenta
31 Mar 192323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1 Sep 196060.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
28 Oct 196060.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
1964²63.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Jul 197777.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bertoglio:
Bishop Francesco Bertoglio (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 113
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1977, Page 765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015