Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Hsane Hgyi

Bishop of Pathein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1953 BornPyingadoe Mayanchaung
7 Mar 198228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pathein, Myanmar
25 Jan 200349.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pathein, Myanmar
25 Jan 200349.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
22 Mar 200349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
24 May 200349.4AppointedBishop of Pathein, Myanmar
24 Aug 200349.7InstalledBishop of Pathein, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John Hsane Hgyi:
Bishop John Hsane Hgyi (born ) Bishop of Pathein

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pathein.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013